+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Died in conference
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference granted, SCs named Simpson, Mazzei, Quinn, David, Fields, Bass, Wyrick
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Transportation
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
- General Order, Amended
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Bennett
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Finance
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 2
- Amended
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Strohm, Shelton
- General Order
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Transportation
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Rousselot
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (11)
+ − Votes (2)
April 19, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Absent: 6
February 9, 2016: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 10