+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/12/2016
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0
- General Order
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Murphey
- First Reading
+ − Votes (3)
April 6, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Absent: 5
March 1, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 90
- Absent: 11
February 9, 2016: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor