+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Title stricken
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Matthews
- CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Pittman
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 25, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 5
February 20, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor