+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Energy
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 62 Nays: 29
- Ayes: 52 Nays: 15
- Amended
- House Rule suspended
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Kouplen
- General Order
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Halligan (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary and Civil Procedure
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Denney
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 1, 2016: House Suspend House Rules
- Yeas: 86
- Absent: 15
March 1, 2016: House Adopt Amendment
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 34
March 1, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 29
- Absent: 10
February 9, 2016: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8