+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/25/2016
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 4
- Authored by Senator Ford (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Elections and Ethics Committee
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Nollan
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
April 18, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 4
February 10, 2016: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor