+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (41)
On May 27, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 06/06/2016
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
- Referred for enrollment
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 38 Nays: 8
- CCR adopted, GCCA
On May 23, 2016 in the House:
- CCR adopted
- Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 7
- To Senate
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- CCR read, GCCA
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Title restored
- CCR submitted
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference granted, GCCA
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
- Engrossed to House
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- General Order, Considered
- Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 7
- Referred for engrossment
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Brooks
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- General Order
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 7
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer
- Referred for engrossment
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Justice (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett
- CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Cox
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (4)
May 26, 2016: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 2
April 20, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 3
February 23, 2016: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 21
February 15, 2016: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 10