+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Died in conference
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference granted, SCs named Sparks, Sykes, Holt, Crain, Loveless, Newberry, Paddack
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1
- General Order, Considered
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Emergency clause stricken
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 2
- Amended
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer
- General Order
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Sparks (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Hoskin
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 20, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
February 10, 2016: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 10