+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
- Title stricken
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Moore
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Miller
- General Order
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 1
- Referred for engrossment
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Newton
- Remove Representative Newton as principal House author and substitute with Representative Mize
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget
- Withdrawn from Rules Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Newton
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 6, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 9
February 27, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 29
February 18, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 9