+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/22/2021
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 2
- General Order, Considered
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0
- Authored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Emergency added
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to General Government
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Representative May
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 9, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 98
- Absent: 3
February 24, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor