+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/07/2021
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
- Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 14
- SA's read, adopted
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 13
- General Order, Considered
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 26
- Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Representative May
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
May 3, 2021: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 14
- Absent: 8
April 21, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 13
- Absent: 2
March 9, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 26
- Absent: 7
February 9, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 9