+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/11/2015
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 17
- JCR adopted
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Direct to Calendar
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 31; Ayes: 56 Nays: 35
- JCR adopted
- General Order
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- JCR; Do Pass Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Treat
- Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author)
- Authored by Representative Sears, Casey
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
April 27, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 31
- Absent: 8
April 27, 2015: House Emergency
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 35
- Absent: 8