+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/12/2015
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
- JCR adopted
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Direct to Calendar
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 2
- JCR adopted
- General Order
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- JCR; Do Pass Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Treat
- Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author)
- Authored by Representative Sears, Casey
- First Reading
+ − Vote
April 28, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 6