+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to General Government
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
- Authored by Senator Haste (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Emergency added
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to County and Municipal Government
- Withdrawn from Rules Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Sims
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 9, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 94
- Absent: 7
February 22, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 10