+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 06/04/2015
- Sent to Governor
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
- Referred for enrollment
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 3
- CCR adopted
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- CCR adopted
- Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 1
- To Senate
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- CCR read
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Title restored
- CCR submitted
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference granted, SCs named Stanislawski, Brown, Jech, Treat, Sparks, Bass, Standridge
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Insurance
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
- Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0
- Referred for engrossment
- Title stricken
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title restored
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance committee; CR filed
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Insurance
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Amended
- General Order
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 1
- Title stricken
- Referred for engrossment
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Insurance
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Mulready
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (2)
May 20, 2015: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 21
March 9, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor