+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/13/2013
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Mulready
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 30
- SA's read, adopted
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3
- General Order, Considered
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Rules committee
- Referred to Judiciary
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Motion expired
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Bingman (principal Senate author)
- Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Grau
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 27
- General Order
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Remove Representative Shannon as principal House author and substitute with Representative Grau
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Insurance
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Shannon
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (7)
May 6, 2013: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 30
- Absent: 4
April 18, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 3
March 13, 2013: House Table Amendment
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 19
- Absent: 25
March 13, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 27
- Absent: 6
March 13, 2013: House Suspend House Rules
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 39
- Absent: 17
March 13, 2013: House Table Amendment To Amendment
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 27
February 28, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1