+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/03/2021
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
- Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0
- SA's read, adopted
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0
- Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Stinson
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 28, 2021: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 88
- Absent: 13
March 9, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 4
February 25, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor