+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/20/2015
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 4
- Amended
- Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Perryman
- General Order
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Hickman
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
March 11, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 6