+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Finance
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Loveless (principal Senate author)
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0
- General Order
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Dorman
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Echols
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 7, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 86
- Absent: 15
February 27, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 25