+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Osburn
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- General Order
- Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author)
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 6
- Referred for engrossment
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
- Authored by Representative Munson
+ − Votes (2)
March 12, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 10
February 20, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor