+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 23, 2014 in the House:
- Died in conference
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference granted, SCs named Marlatt, Griffin, Holt, Ford, Bass, McAffrey
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Rules
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 28 Nays: 16
- Enacting clause restored
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
- Remove as principal author Representative Hickman and substitute with Representative Echols
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed
- Title stricken
- Enacting clause stricken
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Marlatt (principal Senate author)
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 11
- Amended
- General Order
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Rules Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Hickman
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
February 20, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor