+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 2
- Amended
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Lawson
- General Order
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Smalley (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Common Education
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Munson
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 7, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 4
February 26, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 17
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor