+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/17/2015
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 1
- General Order
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Common Education
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Cleveland
- First Reading
+ − Vote
March 11, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 13
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor