+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Pittman
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- General Order
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
- Referred for engrossment
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Representative McEntire
- First Reading
+ − Votes (3)
March 2, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 93
- Absent: 8
February 18, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 32
February 8, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor