+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/06/2019
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
- Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 13
- SA's read, adopted
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 11
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed
- Title stricken
- Referred to Appropriations
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 5
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Fetgatter
- General Order
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Emergency removed
- Authored by Senator Bice (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) McBride
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative O'Donnell
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
April 30, 2019: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 13
- Absent: 17
April 23, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 11
- Absent: 5
March 12, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 7
February 27, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 30
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor