+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Vetoed 04/23/2021
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
- Authored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Rules Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Representative McCall
- First Reading
+ − Votes (2)
March 9, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 94
- Absent: 7
February 16, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
McCall and O'Donnell
Type:
Primary Sponsor