+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/21/2021
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 16
- Coauthored by Senator Burns
- General Order, Considered
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0
- Amended by floor substitute
- House Rule suspended
- Authored by Senator Quinn (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Rules Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Representative McCall
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 14, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 16
- Absent: 2
March 11, 2021: House Suspend House Rules
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 19
March 11, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 87
- Absent: 14
February 23, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor