+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/29/2019
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- Amendment restored bill to engrossed version
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed
- Referred to Appropriations
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0
- Authored by Senator Newhouse (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Luttrell, Pae
- CR; Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Steagall
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 23, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 4
March 12, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 90
- Absent: 11
February 11, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor