+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (40)
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/29/2013
- Sent to Governor
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
- Referred for enrollment
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Sparks
- Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 38 Nays: 1
- CCR adopted
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- CCR adopted
- Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 20
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- CCR read
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- To Senate
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Title restored
- CCR submitted
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- HC's named: Conference Committee on Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference granted, SCs named Treat, Griffin, Bingman, Schulz, Burrage, Sparks
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enacting clause stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- General Order
- Amended
- Title stricken
- Amended
- House Rule suspended
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 10
- Referred for engrossment
- Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author)
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Jackson
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (6)
May 23, 2013: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 9
May 22, 2013: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 20
- Absent: 8
April 24, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Absent: 6
March 14, 2013: House Suspend House Rules
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 7
March 14, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 4
February 27, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3