+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/18/2013
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- To Senate
- Sent to Governor
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
- Coauthored by Shortey
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Brinkley (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Kern
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 3
- General Order
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Henke
- First Reading
+ − Votes (3)
April 10, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Absent: 5
March 4, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 9
February 5, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 15