+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 11
- General Order, Considered
- Coauthored by Shortey
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- General Order
- Authored by Senator Johnson (Rob) (principal Senate author)
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 57 Nays: 35
- Referred for engrossment
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze
- Remove Representative Shannon as principal House author and substitute with Representative Murphey
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Shannon
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 16, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 11
- Absent: 5
March 13, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 35
- Absent: 9
February 27, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 14