+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
- Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative McDugle
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Talley, Fugate
- General Order
- Authored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author)
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 6
- Referred for engrossment
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Remove Representative Fetgatter as principal House author and substitute with Representative Steagall
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Emergency added
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
- Withdrawn from Rules Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Fetgatter
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
March 3, 2022: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 8