+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (4)
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Roberts (Sean)
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
February 27, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 6
February 21, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor