+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/16/2013
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Johnson (Constance)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Kern
- Referred for enrollment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 13
- SA's read, adopted
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 7
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Biggs, Christian, Echols, Fisher
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 15
- Motion to suspend rule failed
- General Order
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Loveless (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Health
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Roberts (Sean)
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
April 16, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 2
March 12, 2013: House Suspend House Rules
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 59
- Absent: 25
March 12, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 7
February 12, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor