+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/30/2019
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 4
- General Order, Considered
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Public Safety
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean)
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
- Amended
- Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules
- Withdrawn from Judiciary Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Mize
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
April 24, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 5
February 27, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 94
- Absent: 7
February 25, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor