+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/27/2021
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
- Sent to Governor
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 6
- General Order, Considered
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Bell
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative West (Josh)
- First Reading
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
- General Order
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Health
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Townley
- First Reading
+ − Votes (3)
April 21, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 5
March 2, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 93
- Absent: 7
February 24, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 9