+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/18/2013
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to General Government
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 1
- General Order
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Anderson (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative McNiel
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 11, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 3
February 27, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 8
February 12, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 16
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor