+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/23/2019
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
- Sent to Governor
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 33 Nays: 7
- CCR adopted
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- CCR read
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- To Senate
- CCR adopted
- Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 25
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Title restored
- CCR submitted
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference granted, SCs named Shaw, Daniels, Paxton, Howard, Brooks, Floyd
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on County and Municipal Government
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- General Order, Considered
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 27 Nays: 15
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enacting clause stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 31
- Title stricken
- Amended
- Authored by Senator Shaw (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Nollan
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
May 17, 2019: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 8
May 16, 2019: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 25
- Absent: 9
April 22, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 6
March 5, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 31
- Absent: 4
February 13, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1