+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Provenzano
On May 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Rader
- Coauthored by Senator Dugger
- Coauthored by Senator Bullard
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to General Government
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Sims, Nichols
- General Order
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 20
- Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author)
- Amended
- Referred for engrossment
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Nollan
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Votes (2)
February 13, 2020: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 20
- Absent: 4
February 20, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 2