+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/16/2019
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 2
- Authored by Senator Haste (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Common Education
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Nollan
- First Reading
+ − Votes (3)
April 9, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 3
February 18, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 4
February 5, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 15