+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Provenzano
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0
- Title stricken
- Amended
- Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author)
- General Order
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Ford
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 12, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 90
- Absent: 11
February 26, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 17
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor