+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Died in conference
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- HC's named: Conference Committee on Public Health
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference granted, GCCA
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- General Order, Considered
- Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
- Referred for engrossment
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Simpson
- Remove as author Senator Simpson; authored by Senator Allen
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enacting clause stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Boggs, Brooks, Dahm
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Enacting clause stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Shortey
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Ownbey, Walker, Fisher, Ritze, Denney, Moore, Hoskin, Cockroft
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0
- Title stricken
- Amended
- General Order
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Emergency added
- Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Smalley
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Public Health
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Bennett
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (4)
March 12, 2013: House Table Amendment
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 49
- Absent: 25
March 12, 2013: House Adopt Amendment
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 33
- Absent: 12
March 12, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 4
February 26, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor