+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Vetoed 04/15/2013
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2
- General Order, Considered
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Motion expired
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Allen (principal Senate author)
- Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Bennett
- Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 12; Ayes: 59 Nays: 24
- General Order
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Judiciary
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Bennett
- First Reading
+ − Votes (4)
April 8, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 4
March 7, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 17
March 7, 2013: House Emergency
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 24
- Absent: 18
February 12, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor