+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/10/2019
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Scott
- Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to General Government
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 1
- Amended
- Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Sims
- General Order
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Boles, Perryman
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 3, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 2
March 13, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 4
February 20, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 11