+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (42)
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/29/2013
- Sent to Governor
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
- Referred for enrollment
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 32 Nays: 8
- CCR adopted, GCCA
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered and deferred
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- CCR adopted
- Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 1
- To Senate
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Mulready, Brown
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- CCR read, GCCA
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Enacting clause restored
- Title restored
- Coauthored by Representative(s) McCullough
- CCR submitted
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- HC's named: GCCA
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference granted, GCCA
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2
- General Order, Considered
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Johnson (Constance)
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enacting clause stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Finance
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Coauthored by Ownbey, Nollan
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer, Proctor, Hoskin, Inman
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
- General Order
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Title stricken
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Shannon
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
May 24, 2013: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 8
May 22, 2013: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 14
April 17, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 4
March 12, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 92
- Absent: 9
February 25, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor