+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 04/30/2019
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
- Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Senator Floyd
- Coauthored by Senator Kirt
- Coauthored by Senator Hicks
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Representative Fugate
- Coauthored by Representative Provenzano
- Coauthored by Representative Virgin
- Coauthored by Representative Pae
- Coauthored by Representative Rosecrants
- Coauthored by Representative Sneed
- Coauthored by Representative Munson
- Coauthored by Representative Miller
- Coauthored by Representative Phillips
- Coauthored by Representative Albright
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- General Order
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 2
- Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author)
- Referred for engrossment
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Higher Education and Career Tech Committee
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education and Career Tech
- Withdrawn from Rules Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Conley
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 24, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Absent: 6
March 7, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 8
February 26, 2019: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor