+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/11/2021
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
- Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 27
- Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 75 Nays: 11
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- SA's read, adopted
- Fourth Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 40
- Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Stark
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 8
- Title restored
- General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
- Title stricken
- Referred to Appropriations
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author)
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Munson, Mize
- General Order
- Amended
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 14
- Referred for engrossment
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Tammy)
- Remove Representative West (Tammy) as principal House author and substitute with Representative Stark
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Children, Youth and Family Services
- Withdrawn from Rules Committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Rules
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Authored by Representative West (Tammy)
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (4)
May 6, 2021: House Reconsider Measure
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 11
- Absent: 15
May 5, 2021: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 40
- Absent: 19
March 9, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 82
- Nays: 14
- Absent: 5
February 23, 2021: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 5