+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Coauthored by Senator(s) Sharp
- CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- HC's named: GCCA
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference granted, GCCA
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 1
- General Order, Considered
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enacting clause stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Finance
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 13; Ayes: 57 Nays: 23
- General Order
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Title stricken
- Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative McCall
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
April 18, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 7
March 7, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 13
- Absent: 13
March 7, 2013: House Emergency
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 23
- Absent: 21
February 27, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 1
February 18, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor