+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/31/2013
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0
- CCR adopted, GCCA
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Referred for enrollment
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- CCR read, GCCA
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- To Senate
- CCR adopted, GCCA
- Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Title restored
- CCR submitted, GCCA
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- HC's named: GCCA
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference granted, GCCA
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- General Order, Considered
- Referred for engrossment
- Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title stricken
- Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Finance
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Motion expired
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative McCall
- Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 4; Ayes: 54 Nays: 37
- General Order
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative McCall
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
May 24, 2013: Senate Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Absent: 9
May 16, 2013: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 91
- Absent: 10
April 10, 2013: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Absent: 5
March 6, 2013: House Emergency
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 37
- Absent: 10
March 6, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 5
February 25, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 24
February 18, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor