+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Johnson (Constance)
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
- Referred to Appropriations
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 3
- General Order
- Referred for engrossment
- Coauthored by Representative(s) Condit
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Anderson (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Calendar; rereferred to Public Health Committee
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health Committee
- Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Billy
- First Reading
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 13, 2013: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 8
February 26, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 9
February 12, 2013: House Committee Vote
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3