+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 05/06/2015
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed, to Senate
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for enrollment
- Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 0
- SA's read, adopted
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- SA's received
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed to House
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred for engrossment
- Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1
- Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
- General Order, Considered
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed
- Emergency added
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading referred to Energy
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Coauthored by Jordan
- First Reading
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed, signed, to Senate
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred for engrossment
- Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0
- Amended
- General Order
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Authored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author)
- CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Environmental Law Committee
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading referred to Environmental Law
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Martin
- First Reading
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
April 29, 2015: House Fourth Reading
- Yeas: 81
- Absent: 18
March 2, 2015: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 98
- Absent: 3